Financial history THE WINDSOR ROYAL FREE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1045518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £4.79k £3.55k £1.02k £1.00k £215
Total expenditure £1.75k £250 £4.24k £250 £564
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A