Financial history SOMERSET AND DORSET RAILWAY HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1045547
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £83.37k £76.00k £418.57k £345.67k £106.76k
Total expenditure £75.00k £60.50k £99.75k £139.43k £81.18k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k £3.00k £1.50k N/A £10.00k