CHARIGUARD OVERSEAS EQUITY FUND

Charity number: 1045682
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020
Annual return 30 June 2019
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019
Annual return 30 June 2018
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018
Annual return 30 June 2017
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017
Annual return 30 June 2016
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016