CHARIGUARD OVERSEAS EQUITY FUND

Charity number: 1045682
Charity is a Common Investment Fund
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2011 30/06/2012 30/06/2013 30/06/2014 30/06/2015
Total gross income £1.43m £1.59m £1.25m £1.07m £657.00k
Total expenditure £277.00k £263.00k £242.00k £271.00k £572.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £1.43m £1.59m £1.25m £1.07m N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £277.00k £263.00k £242.00k £271.00k N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A