Financial history THE COCHRANE COLLABORATION

Charity number: 1045921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.81m £8.67m £9.80m £8.08m £12.83m
Total expenditure £8.09m £8.11m £8.48m £9.14m £9.05m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £72.85k £20.72k £5.21k £4.32k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £6.66m £8.65m £9.78m £8.05m £12.82m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £71.14k £3.27k £13.80k £22.85k £10.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.79m £7.78m £8.30m £8.96m £8.94m
Expenditure - Raising funds £299.22k £321.87k £185.24k £181.11k £111.00k
Expenditure - Governance £306.58k £236.94k £281.91k £188.81k £395.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £575.83k £386.87k £0 £749.73k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0