Financial history THE DIAMOND CENTRE FOR DISABLED RIDERS

Charity number: 1045970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £612.11k £322.90k £279.30k £287.54k £363.51k
Total expenditure £595.60k £487.47k £443.20k £399.26k £318.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £55.89k
Income - Donations and legacies £440.84k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £32.73k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £96.04k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £42.51k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £336.97k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £573.69k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £21.91k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A