Financial history CAMBRIDGE JOINT PLAYSCHEMES

Charity number: 1045987
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £50.16k £30.07k £55.32k £55.89k £61.52k
Total expenditure £46.14k £41.02k £43.93k £57.60k £43.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A