27TH NORWICH (NEW COSTESSEY) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1046258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.50k £46.25k £10.21k £16.87k £11.48k
Total expenditure £6.32k £46.02k £10.85k £11.69k £11.66k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A