Accounts and annual returns Y GRONFA YMDDIRIEDOLAETH (THE TRUST FUND)

Charity number: 1046291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required