THE POPDA SOCIETY

Charity number: 1046323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £89.79k £15.27k £15.51k £15.70k £84.68k
Total expenditure £29.37k £15.99k £6.56k £9.81k £34.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A