2ND REDRUTH (ST ANDREWS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1046451
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.84k £11.23k £16.12k £7.49k £12.50k
Total expenditure £7.63k £11.12k £17.74k £9.07k £9.68k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A