WADDINGTON REDWOOD PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1046691
Charity reporting is overdue by 883 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 152 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 152 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 517 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 517 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 883 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 883 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 13 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 29 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required