WADDINGTON REDWOOD PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1046691
Charity reporting is overdue by 893 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £26.92k £17.29k £17.29k £7.38k £804
Total expenditure £27.24k £18.42k £19.42k £9.97k £1.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A