Accounts and annual returns ROTARY CLUB OF HARROGATE BRIGANTES CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1046738
Charity reporting is overdue by 74 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 74 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 74 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 08 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 13 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 28 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 03 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 10 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window