Governing document HERTS VISION LOSS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 MAR 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 JAN 2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
TO GRANT ASSISTANCE TO ALL BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PERSONS ORDINARILY RESIDENT IN HERTFORDSHIRE OR IN NEIGHBOURING AREAS; TO CARRY ON ALL SUCH ACTIVITIES AS MAY BE CONDUCIVE TO PROVIDING FOR THE NEEDS OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PERSONS; AND TO CARRY ON ALL SUCH ACTIVITIES AS MAY BE CONDUCIVE TO THE PREVENTION, ALLEVIATION OR CURE OF PROBLEMS RELATING TO EYESIGHT.
Area of benefit
HERTFORDSHIRE OR IN NEIGHBOURING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.