Trustees HERTS VISION LOSS
Charity number: 1047148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Alexandra Hickinbotham | Chair | 05 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Janet Picken MA, M.Sc. | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Raj Visram | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Ottolangui | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Macdougall | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Taylor | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Charles Creswick Page | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Duff Warner-Smith | Trustee | 24 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD SEAMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.