Derbyshire Japanese School

Charity number: 1047319
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £128.92k £123.01k £142.18k £153.44k £141.61k
Total expenditure £144.89k £116.61k £123.91k £160.65k £147.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A