New Earth Theatre Limited

Charity number: 1047991
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £142.09k £114.34k £361.86k £311.35k £273.14k
Total expenditure £125.87k £99.99k £331.45k £133.94k £207.37k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A