New Earth Theatre Limited

Charity number: 1047991
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WAI MUN YOON Chair None on record
JONATHAN KENNEDY Trustee 08 December 2012 None on record
Kithmini Wimalasekera Trustee 04 October 2018 None on record
Katie Elston Trustee 03 December 2018 None on record
MANINDER GILL Trustee 26 May 2011 None on record
RICHARD SHANNON Trustee 10 January 2018 None on record