2ND NORTHOLT (WOOD END) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1048150
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 12 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 28 December 2017 On time Download