Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1048159
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £12.69k £6 £1.90k £475 £2.29k
Total expenditure £3.34k £13.17k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A