Accounts and annual returns ROTARY CLUB OF MORLEY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1048573
Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 22 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Overdue by 22 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 22 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 22 February 2021 298 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 23 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required