Governing document THE NORTH LONDON UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 JUN 1995 AS AMENDED ON 27 JAN 1997 AS AMENDED ON 14 JUN 1999 AS AMENDED ON 07 JUL 2003 AS AMENDED ON 14 JUL 2014 AS AMENDED ON 08 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
The charity’s object (‘the object’) is the advancement of education and in particular the education of older people and those retired from full time work, by all means including associated activities conducive to learning and personal development in Barnet, Haringey and surrounding area.
Area of benefit
CROUCH END, FINCHLEY, GOLDERS GREEN, HAMPSTEAD, HENDON, HORNSEY, HIGHGATE, ISLINGTON, MUSWELL HILL, SWISS COTTAGE AND THEIR SURROUNDING LOCALITIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.