Trustees THE NORTH LONDON UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1048587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Alan Johns | Chair | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jean Naomi Susan Watt | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael George Lewin | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Silver | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marion Fitzpatrick | Trustee | 30 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roy Henry William Seger | Trustee | 09 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Henrietta Cohen | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Edmond Cohen | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.