Financial history ST.JOSEPH'S CATHOLIC INFANT SCHOOL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1048818
Charity reporting is overdue by 716 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £5.56k £5.56k £8.09k £5.17k £841
Total expenditure £4.18k £4.18k £3.17k £1.25k £6.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A