WHEATFIELDS JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1048980
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 05 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 April 2021 297 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 12 July 2019 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 14 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required