WHEATFIELDS JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1048980
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £17.79k £16.83k £20.21k £11.70k £14.87k
Total expenditure £6.36k £12.81k £15.68k £11.80k £21.54k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A