Accounts and annual returns GO 89

Charity number: 1049415
Charity reporting is overdue by 1695 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 234 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 234 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 599 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 599 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 964 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 964 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1329 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1329 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1695 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1695 days