AGE UK NORTH TYNESIDE

Charity number: 1049527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.47m £4.73m £5.05m £4.83m £5.16m
Total expenditure £4.68m £4.73m £5.09m £4.88m £5.11m
Income from government contracts £3.05m £3.41m £612.20k £3.17m £3.50m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £129.42k £12.84k
Income - Donations and legacies £26.66k £25.03k £84.52k £24.02k £27.94k
Income - Other trading activities £117.86k £247.17k £3.70m £3.43m £3.79m
Income - Charitable activities £4.29m £4.40m £1.25m £1.37m £1.34m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.09k £52.77k £49 £556 £429
Income - Other £32.64k £3.69k £17.39k £1.02k £0
Income - Legacies £26.66k £0 £51.67k £1.07k £2.10k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.47m £4.72m £1.86m £1.85m £1.81m
Expenditure - Raising funds £205.33k £3.34k £0 £3.03m £3.30m
Expenditure - Governance £5.90k £0 £39.57k £44.78k £45.85k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £5.38k £1.82k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £4.01k £2.86k £3.23m £0 £0