Trustees AGE UK NORTH TYNESIDE
Charity number: 1049527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alyson Lynn Scurfield | Chair | 21 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Brown | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Carole Brown | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Louise Rowell | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lee Jon Gilder | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexandra Kent | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Cotton | Trustee | 03 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Swan | Trustee | 24 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Harrison | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.