BABEL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1050083
Charity reporting is overdue by 395 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 21 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 30 days
Accounts and TAR 21 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 30 days
Annual return 21 October 2019 Overdue Overdue by 395 days
Accounts and TAR 21 October 2019 Overdue Overdue by 395 days
Annual return 21 October 2018 07 September 2020 383 days late
Accounts and TAR 21 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 21 October 2017 18 July 2019 331 days late
Accounts and TAR 21 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 21 October 2016 01 October 2017 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 21 October 2016 Not Required