BABEL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1050083
Charity reporting is overdue by 395 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 21/10/2014 22/10/2015 21/10/2016 21/10/2017 21/10/2018
Total gross income £3.82k £3.82k £3.42k £3.43k £3.21k
Total expenditure £2.97k £2.97k £1.64k £3.77k £2.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A