ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1050239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 July 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 July 2021 374 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 14 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 25 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required