Financial history AL-ASR SCHOLASTIC RESEARCH ESTABLISHMENT LONDON UK

Charity number: 1050383
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £152.47k £177.39k £228.19k £110.97k £120.38k
Total expenditure £73.60k £89.12k £215.86k £78.81k £84.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £9.88k £9.15k