Totternhoe CE Academy Parents' Association

Charity number: 1050415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £12.11k £9.55k £13.14k £17.19k £7.33k
Total expenditure £6.78k £13.25k £9.13k £15.26k £14.80k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A