Trustees THE WHITE CLIFFS COUNTRY U3A

Charity number: 1050607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison Murphy Trustee 12 August 2022
None on record
Catherine Hoddell Trustee 17 June 2022
None on record
Judith Oakley Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Susan Edwards Trustee 15 September 2021
None on record
Eleanor Brooks Trustee 13 August 2021
WEST KENT AREA QUAKER MEETING OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN
Received: On time
Anne Matthews Trustee 16 September 2020
None on record
Mary Venables Trustee 11 October 2019
None on record
William Venables Trustee 19 June 2019
None on record
Jill Jones Trustee 25 May 2016
None on record
Barry Matthews Trustee 25 May 2016
None on record