Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF BEACONSFIELD

Charity number: 1051012
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £11.43k £4.68k £7.98k £13.25k £890
Total expenditure £1.60k £10.87k £3.81k £13.27k £2.84k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £2.00k N/A