Financial history THE HEREFORD CATHEDRAL PERPETUAL TRUST

Charity number: 1051168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.28m £2.53m £967.35k £2.01m £646.45k
Total expenditure £1.27m £1.11m £996.46k £1.12m £524.43k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £5.03k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.10m £2.31m £677.66k £1.82m £454.21k
Income - Other trading activities £111.83k £103.70k £145.19k £21.40k £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £74.86k £96.66k £144.51k £167.18k £188.07k
Income - Other £0 £17.00k £0 £0 £4.16k
Income - Legacies £10.25k £1.05m £156.50k £870.40k £49.26k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.13m £855.63k £832.58k £1.08m £457.30k
Expenditure - Raising funds £137.99k £257.39k £163.88k £46.93k £67.12k
Expenditure - Governance £40.33k £4.34k £49.02k £52.68k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.04m £776.79k £744.95k £977.32k £380.63k
Expenditure - Investment management £7.52k £7.84k £9.62k £11.51k £10.77k
Expenditure - Other £2.63k £0 £0 £0 £0