Financial history ST GEORGE'S HALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1051396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £16.25k £89.24k £49.88k £3.14k £14.80k
Total expenditure £644 £68.38k £62.02k £5.43k £10.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A