Trustees ST GEORGE'S HALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1051396
Charity reporting is overdue by 5 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CLAIRE DOVE Chair 19 January 2017
None on record
JOHN PRINCE Trustee 25 September 2023
THE LIVERPOOL COUNCIL OF EDUCATION (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
HARRY DOYLE Trustee 25 September 2023
None on record
Laurence Sidorczuk Trustee 25 September 2023
None on record
SARA MARIE LAWTON Trustee 15 September 2022
None on record
EMLYN JOHN WRIGHT Trustee 15 September 2022
None on record
LESLEY ANN PENTON Trustee 15 September 2022
None on record
Professor Elizabeth Thirlestane MAITLAND Trustee 25 June 2019
None on record
STEVEN HUNT Trustee 07 December 2017
None on record
SYLVIA LEWIS Trustee 28 August 2012
ROTARY CLUB OF LIVERPOOL WEST DERBY TRUST FUND
Received: On time
JAYNE LOUISE MOORE Trustee 28 August 2012
None on record
GARY MILLAR Trustee
THE CORNERSTONES FOUNDATION
Received: On time