Financial history MUSIC IN HOSPITALS AND CARE

Charity number: 1051659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.38m £1.23m £1.79m £1.24m £816.10k
Total expenditure £1.37m £1.27m £1.43m £918.82k £918.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.58k £11.53k £30.00k £498.39k £390.36k
Income - Donations and legacies £982.57k £903.90k £1.40m £1.05m £719.83k
Income - Other trading activities £51.83k £56.36k £106.24k £49.94k £0
Income - Charitable activities £221.97k £236.54k £249.68k £13.53k £52.85k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £36.12k £36.74k £38.81k £27.28k £22.86k
Income - Other £87.00k £85 £0 £98.82k £20.56k
Income - Legacies £11.00k £0 £449.01k £34.05k £14.78k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.12m £1.04m £1.19m £773.78k £764.06k
Expenditure - Raising funds £252.42k £235.89k £243.73k £145.04k £154.71k
Expenditure - Governance £12.36k £13.08k £0 £10.11k £18.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £9.05k £12.21k £8.76k £8.44k £8.41k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0