Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST BEES SCHOOL GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1051935
Charity reporting is overdue by 16 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 16 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 16 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required