CURLEDGE STREET ACADEMY PTA

Charity number: 1052070
Charity reporting is overdue by 474 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 109 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 109 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 474 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 474 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 July 2019 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 06 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 14 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required