LONDON SCHOOLS ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1052204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 20 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 18 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 20 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 24 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required