LONDON SCHOOLS ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1052204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £23.10k £24.60k £22.82k £23.30k £9.20k
Total expenditure £21.10k £22.50k £20.86k £24.90k £6.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A