EAST MANCHESTER COMMUNITY BOAT PROJECT

Charity number: 1052320
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £13.16k £5.59k £7.39k £11.91k £14.53k
Total expenditure £5.72k £13.78k £6.70k £7.21k £7.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A