SANT BANI (UK)

Charity number: 1052402
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 06 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 06 April 2020 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 06 February 2019 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 16 April 2018 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 24 April 2017 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not Required