NEWBOLD COLLEGE

Charity number: 1052494
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.12m £4.93m £4.91m £4.42m £3.64m
Total expenditure £3.74m £3.90m £4.03m £4.41m £3.66m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £241.73k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.80m £1.84m £2.24m £1.82m £1.78m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.35m £2.64m £2.67m £2.60m £1.62m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £493 £1.49k £404 £2.67k £1.20k
Income - Other £963.81k £442.82k £0 £0 £241.73k
Income - Legacies £176.55k £142.57k £424.46k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.71m £3.84m £3.96m £4.34m £3.61m
Expenditure - Raising funds £33.30k £53.18k £70.29k £70.92k £43.59k
Expenditure - Governance £19.63k £19.42k £22.34k £20.68k £11.74k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0