NEWBOLD COLLEGE

Charity number: 1052494
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Pastor Emmanuel Osei Trustee 01 April 2017
SEVENTH-DAY ADVENTIST ASSOCIATION LIMITED
BRITISH UNION CONFERENCE OF SEVENTH-DAY ADVENTISTS Received: On time
SOUTH ENGLAND CONFERENCE OF SEVENTH DAY ADVENTISTS Received: On time
ADVENTIST RADIO LONDON Received: On time
THE STANBOROUGH PRESS LIMITED Received: On time
Natalie Henry Trustee 22 November 2020 None on record
Dr JOHN BAILDAM Trustee 17 June 2014 None on record
Rev Rob De Raad Trustee 01 June 2017 None on record
Rev Victor Marley Trustee 01 August 2017 None on record
STYRKAR ALVAR DRAMSTAD Trustee None on record
Gina Abbequaye Trustee 22 November 2020 None on record
Dr DANIEL DUDA Trustee
ADVENTIST DEVELOPMENT AND RELIEF AGENCY - TRANS EUROPEAN DIVISION Received: On time
Rev Dragan Grujicic Trustee 19 May 2019 None on record
Audrey Andersson Trustee 04 November 2012
ADVENTIST DEVELOPMENT AND RELIEF AGENCY - TRANS EUROPEAN DIVISION Received: On time
Dr PATRICK JOHNSON Trustee 01 May 2016
ADVENTIST DEVELOPMENT AND RELIEF AGENCY - TRANS EUROPEAN DIVISION Received: On time
Rev Richard Jackson Trustee 22 November 2020 None on record
IAN REDFERN Trustee 11 May 2014 None on record
Nenad Jepuranovic Trustee 17 November 2013
ADVENTIST DEVELOPMENT AND RELIEF AGENCY - TRANS EUROPEAN DIVISION Received: On time
WORLD WIDE ADVENT MISSIONS LIMITED Received: On time
Pastor Raafat Kamal Chair
ADVENTIST DEVELOPMENT AND RELIEF AGENCY - TRANS EUROPEAN DIVISION Received: On time
Carsten Waern Trustee 22 November 2020 None on record
Dr Paul Thompson Trustee 22 November 2020 None on record
Pastor Ian Walter Wellington Sweeney Trustee 04 November 2012
SEVENTH-DAY ADVENTIST ASSOCIATION LIMITED
WORLD WIDE ADVENT MISSIONS LIMITED Received: On time
THE STANBOROUGH PRESS LIMITED Received: On time