Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST MARYS SCHOOL LONG DITTON

Charity number: 1052633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £19.34k £21.70k £41.00k £13.99k £13.02k
Total expenditure £13.27k £22.52k £39.23k £18.16k £12.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A